EP0499977 - Method of manufacturing a chemically adsorbed film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mino, Norihisa 4-6-8-806, Senrioka Higashi Settsu-shi 566, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yamagata, Yoshikazu 22-13, Touda-cho 5-chome Moriguchi-shi 570, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 30-5, Higashi Nakafuri 1-chome Hirakata-shi 573, Osaka / JP | [1995/51] |
Former [1992/35] | 01 /
Mino, Norihisa 4-6-8-806, Senrioka Higashi Settsu-shi 566, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Yamagata, Yoshikazu 22-13, Touda-cho 5-chome Moriguchi-shi 570, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 30-5, Higashi Nakafumi 1-chome Hirakata-shi 573, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102491.5 | 14.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910047747 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4774791 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499977 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499977 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/18, C09D4/00 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
B05D1/185 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08G77/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines chemisch absorbierten Films | [1992/35] | English: | Method of manufacturing a chemically adsorbed film | [1992/35] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un film chimiquement adsorbé | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 19.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0386784 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |