EP0500010 - Stabilised silane grafted polyolefin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.1993 [1993/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses 92111 Clichy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses F-92111 Clichy Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrière, Eric 185, avenue Berthelot F-69007 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Prigent, Madeleine 10 Allée des fraises F-91460 Marcoussis / FR | 03 /
Antolinos, Chantal 39, rue de la République F-69740 Gonas / FR | 04 /
Assier, Jean-Claude 13 Villa des 3 Cailloux F-91860 Epinay sous Senart / FR | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102599.5 | 17.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | FR19910002079 | 21.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9102079 | [1992/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500010 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/06, C08L43/04, C08K3/22, C08K5/29 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
C08L43/04 (EP);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K5/29 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L43/04 (EP);
C08K5/29, C08L51/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Stabilisiertes Silan-gepfropftes Polyolefin | [1992/35] | English: | Stabilised silane grafted polyolefin | [1992/35] | French: | Polyoléfine stabilisée greffée par un silane | [1992/35] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/45] | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4681913 ; | [A]EP0149903 ; | [A]FR1349641 ; | [A]EP0228505 ; | [A]EP0264336 |