EP0514625 - Method of making a label with adhesive-free lifting portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.1994 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALLACE COMPUTER SERVICES, INC. 4600 W. Roosevelt Road Hillside, IL 60162 / US | [1992/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Donald 878 Poplar Elmhurst. Illinois 60126 / US | 02 /
Chudzik, Anthony 3417-1/2 South Lombard Cicero, Illinois 60650 / US | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/48] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102684.5 | 18.02.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | US19910705325 | 24.05.1991 Original published format: US 705325 | [1992/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0514625 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0514625 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, B31D1/02, B32B7/06 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
G09F3/02 (EP);
G09F2003/0201 (EP);
G09F2003/0222 (EP);
G09F2003/0226 (EP);
G09F2003/0267 (EP);
G09F2003/0269 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Etikettes mit einem klebstoffreien Teil | [1992/48] | English: | Method of making a label with adhesive-free lifting portion | [1992/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une étiquette comprenant une partie sans adhésif pour le décollage | [1992/48] | File destroyed: | 30.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/43] | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.10.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0153185 ; | [YD]US4664416 ; | [Y]EP0299598 ; | [A]US4188427 ; | [AD]US5011559 ; | [AD]US4526405 ; | [A]GB2164915 ; | [A]US2220071 ; | [A]WO9014218 |