EP0501320 - Immunopotentiating drug containing an anti-testosterone antibody [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirasawa, Keisuke 12-11 Nakajuku Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states Hirasawa, Keisuke 12-11 Nakajuku Itabashi-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Türk, Dietmar Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102897.3 | 21.02.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | JP19910030749 | 26.02.1991 Original published format: JP 3074991 | JP19910213452 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21345291 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0501320 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/00, A61K39/395 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/26 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | Antitestosterone Antikörper enthaltende immunstärkende Arzneimittel | [1992/36] | English: | Immunopotentiating drug containing an anti-testosterone antibody | [1992/36] | French: | Médicament renforçant l'immunité contenant un anticorps antitestostérone | [1992/36] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 29.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/28] | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.1994 | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4197286 (RAO PEMMARAJU N [US]); | [A]EP0226985 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [X] - MEDLINE Abstract number: 91118507, HIRASAWA K. et al: "Sex-associated differences in organ transplantation: different effects of steroid hormones, testosterone, estradiol progesterone, and prednisolone on the survival time off allogeneic skin graft in rats treated with cyclosporine A." & TRANSPLANT PROC., February 1991, 23p 714-715 | [XD] - MEDLINE Abstract number: 91020368, HIRASAWA K. et al: "Effects of sex steroid hormones on sex-associated differences in the survival time of allogeneic skin grafts in rats" Evidence that testosterone enhances and estradiol reverses the immunosuppresive activity of cyclosporine. & TRANSPLANTATION, October 1990, 50 (4)p 637-41 | [X] - MEDLINE Abstract number: 89326493, CARLSTEN H. et al: "Oestradiol suppression of delayed-type hypersensitivity in autoimmune (NZB/NZW) F1 mice is a trait inherited from the healthy NZW parental strain." & IMMUNOLOGY, June 1989, 67(2)p 205-9 |