EP0500119 - CVD diamond coated cutting tools and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamura, Toshihiko, Tsukuba-Seisakusho Mitsubishi Materials Corp., 1511, Ooaza Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102924.5 | 21.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910049099 | 21.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4909991 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500119 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500119 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C16/02 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
C23C16/27 (EP,US);
C23C16/0227 (EP,US);
C23C16/0254 (EP,US);
H04M3/2254 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0025 (EP,US);
Y10T407/27 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | CVD-Diamantbeschichtete Schneidwerkzeuge und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1992/35] | English: | CVD diamond coated cutting tools and method of manufacture | [1992/35] | French: | Outils coupants revêtus, en phase vapeur, de diamant et procédé de fabrication | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 07.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.1998
15.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT | [2012/17] |
Former [2004/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.1998
15.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE CERATIZIT Austria Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT Opponent's representative Lohnert, Wolfgang, Dr. Plansee Tizit GmbH Recht/Patent 6600 Reutte / AT | ||
Former [1998/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.03.1998
PLANSEE TIZIT GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. A-6600 Reutte/Tirol / AT Opponent's representative Lohnert, Wolfgang Lähn 12 6600 Breitenwang / Reutte / AT | 20.04.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.08.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.08.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1998 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 06.08.2015 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.02.1998 | ES | 23.02.1998 | GB | 21.02.2004 | FR | 29.10.2004 | IT | 21.02.2005 | DE | 22.02.2012 | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/34] | SE | 22.02.1998 | |
ES | 23.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.02.2004 | ||
FR | 29.10.2004 | ||
IT | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/19] | SE | 22.02.1998 | |
ES | 23.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.02.2004 | ||
FR | 29.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | SE | 22.02.1998 | |
ES | 23.02.1998 | ||
GB | 21.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/37] | SE | 22.02.1998 | |
ES | 23.02.1998 | ||
Former [2002/14] | SE | 22.02.1998 | |
ES | 01.07.2001 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 22.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63069971 ; | [YD]JP1246361 ; | [A]JP62067174 ; | [A]JP63199870 ; | [A]JP2088782 ; | [A]JP1119671 ; | [A]EP0374923 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 299 (C-520)15 August 1988 & JP-A-63 069 971 ( TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD ) 30 March 1988, & JP63069971 A 19880330 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 589 (C-670)25 December 1989 & JP-A-1 246 361 ( TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD ) 2 October 1989, & JP1246361 A 19891002 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 267 (C-443)28 August 1987 & JP-A-62 067 174 ( SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD ) 26 March 1987, & JP62067174 A 19870326 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 482 (C-553)15 December 1988 & JP-A-63 199 870 ( SHOWA DENKO K.K. ) 18 August 1988, & JP63199870 A 19880818 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 284 (C-730)20 June 1990 & JP-A-2 088 782 ( HITACHI LTD ) 28 March 1990, & JP2088782 A 19900328 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 362 (C-625)14 August 1987 & JP-A-1 119 671 ( MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD ) 11 May 1989, & JP1119671 A 19890511 |