EP0505734 - Separator for the purification of waste waters contaminated with floating and suspended matters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PASSAVANT-WERKE AG 65322 Aarbergen 7 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states PASSAVANT-WERKE AG D-65322 Aarbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiler, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelmstrasse 59 W-6252 Diez / DE | 02 /
Bachon, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelmstrasse 59 W-6252 Diez / DE | [1992/40] | Application number, filing date | 92102955.9 | 21.02.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | DE19914105567 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4105567 | [1992/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0505734 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0505734 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/032, B01D21/24 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
B01D17/00 (EP);
B01D17/0208 (EP);
B01D17/0214 (EP);
B01D21/10 (EP);
B01D21/24 (EP);
B01D21/2411 (EP);
B01D21/2427 (EP);
B01D21/2433 (EP);
B01D21/245 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1992/40] | B01D17/025, B01D17/038, B01D21/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1992/40] | Title | German: | Abscheider zum Reinigen von mit Leicht- und Sinkstoffen verschmutzten Abwässern | [1992/40] | English: | Separator for the purification of waste waters contaminated with floating and suspended matters | [1992/40] | French: | Séparateur pour l'épuration d'eaux usées contaminées par des matières flottantes et sédimentaires | [1992/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.1992 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   15.06.1992 | 15.05.1992 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   15.06.1992 | 15.05.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   15.06.1992 | 15.05.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   15.06.1992 | 15.05.1992 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.06.1992 | 15.05.1992 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   15.06.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3820142 ; | [Y]DE109719 ; | [A]CH492466 ; | [A]US3670643 ; | [AP]DE9104255U |