EP0505756 - Lampholder especially for halogen lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brökelmann, Jaeger & Busse GmbH & Co Werler Strasse 1 D-59755 Arnsberg / DE | [1992/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henrici, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Gabelsbergerstrasse 9 W-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE | 02 /
Bothe, Alfred Zum Mühlenstück 3 W-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwälte Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1992/40] | Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Postfach 20 16 53 D-42216 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103322.1 | 27.02.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | DE19914109678 | 23.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109678 | [1992/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505756 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505756 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/09, H01R13/506, F21V19/00 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
H01R33/05 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R2201/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Lampenfassung, insbesondere für Halogenlampen | [1992/40] | English: | Lampholder especially for halogen lamps | [1992/40] | French: | Culot en particulier pour lampes halogènes | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2560427 (MAVILLE PARIS CREATIONS [FR]); | [A]EP0198423 (GTE PROD CORP [US]); | [A]DE8806272U ; | [XP]DE9103617U |