EP0557561 - Serial data link utilising NRZI and Manchester code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohler, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. GH Lärchenstrasse 3 W-7256 Mönsheim / DE | 02 /
Köhler, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Wengertsteige 33 W-7038 Holzgerlingen / DE | 03 /
Gervais, Gilles, Dipl.-Ing. Mörikestrasse 14 W-7039 Breitenstein / DE | 04 /
Schumacher, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing. Baumstrasse 10 W-7531 Neuhausen / DE | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Mönig, Anton IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103410.4 | 28.02.1992 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557561 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
H04L25/4904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Serielle Datenstrecke mit NRZI und Manchester Kodierung | [1993/35] | English: | Serial data link utilising NRZI and Manchester code | [1993/35] | French: | Liaison de données en série utilisant le codage NRZI et Manchester | [1993/35] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/08] | 01.03.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP3204061 ; | [A]JP3165647 ; | [Y]EP0168770 ; | [Y]EP0124959 ; | [A]EP0094178 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 477 (P-1283)4 December 1991 & JP-A-32 04 061 ( NEC ), & JP3204061 A 19911204 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 405 (E-1122)16 October 1991 & JP-A-31 65 647 ( FUJITSU LTD. ), & JP3165647 A 19911016 |