EP0534047 - Apparatus for the reduction of deformation of the exterior walls of vacuum chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25, Postfach 1555 D-63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/13] | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25, Postfach 1555 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pawlakowitsch, Anton, Dr. Danziger Strasse 5 W-8752 Mömbris / DE | 02 /
Schönherr, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Ludwigstrasse 112 W-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | [1993/13] | Application number, filing date | 92103427.8 | 28.02.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | DE19914132204 | 27.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4132204 | [1993/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0534047 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534047 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/56, C23C14/22, B01J3/00 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
B01J3/002 (EP,US);
C23C14/56 (EP,US);
C23C14/562 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reduzierung der Durchbiegung von Aussenwänden an Vakuumbehältern | [1993/13] | English: | Apparatus for the reduction of deformation of the exterior walls of vacuum chambers | [1993/13] | French: | Dispositif pour réduire la déformation des parois externes des chambres à vide | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8202246 (BITTERLY JACK GORDON); | [A]EP0374060 (TECHMETA SA [FR]); | [A]US4014779 (KUEHNLE MANFRED R) |