EP0502467 - Holding device for toroidal core throttle of a main plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taller GmbH Im Ermlisgrund 11 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states Taller GmbH Im Ermlisgrund 11 D-76337 Waldbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waible, Thomas Schillerstrasse 9 W-7517 Waldbronn / DE | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Zahn, Roland Berghausener Strasse 10 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Im Speitel 102 D-76229 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103597.8 | 02.03.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | DE19914107302 | 07.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4107302 | DE19914114036 | 29.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4114036 | [1992/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502467 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502467 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/719 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
H01R13/6633 (EP);
H01R31/005 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/28 (EP);
H01R43/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1992/37] | Title | German: | Halterung für eine Ringkerndrossel eines elektrischen Netzsteckers | [1992/37] | English: | Holding device for toroidal core throttle of a main plug | [1992/37] | French: | Support pour étrangleur toroidal d'une fiche de secteur | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.1995
04.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE VOGT electronic AG Erlautal 7 D-94130 Obernzell / DE Opponent's representative Hieke, Kurt Stadlerstrasse 3 85540 Haar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.1995
04.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE VOGT electronic AG . D-94130 Obernzell / DE Opponent's representative Hieke, Kurt Stadlerstrasse 3 D-85540 Haar / DE | 20.07.1995 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 01.08.1995 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.08.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 30.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 30.11.1995 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.10.1994 | FR | 12.10.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 12.10.1994 | |
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | FR | 10.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7623595U ; | [A]DE3842038 (VOGT ELECTRONIC AG [DE]); | [A]DE3922398 (VOGT ELECTRONIC AG [DE]); | [A]EP0090774 (FELLER AG [CH]); | [AD]EP0184009 (VOGT ELECTRONIC AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0468314 |