EP0503448 - Method for making a superconducting current limiter as well as a current limiter produced with such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abeln, Angelika, Dr. Breslauer Strasse 19 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Hermes, Stefan L 11, 6-7 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Knaak, Wolfgang, Dr. Langgewann 34 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Jahnke, Bernd, Dr. Gottlob-Kamm-Strasse 11 D-6903 Neckargemünd / DE | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103652.1 | 03.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | DE19914107686 | 09.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4107686 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503448 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503448 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, H01L39/14, H01L39/20, H01L39/24 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
H02H9/023 (EP);
H10N60/30 (EP);
H10N60/81 (EP);
Y02E40/60 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/38] | H01L39/24, H01L39/14, H01L39/20, H02H9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines supraleitenden Strombegrenzers sowie ein entsprechend hergestellter Strombegrenzer | [1992/38] | English: | Method for making a superconducting current limiter as well as a current limiter produced with such a method | [1992/38] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un limiter de courant supraconducteur et limiter de courant obtenu par le procédé | [1992/38] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/11] | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01206828 ; | [A]US3704391 (MCCONNELL LORNE D); | [A]EP0306287 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]); | [X]EP0315976 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [X]EP0345767 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]); | [A]US4943792 (SRIVASTAVA VISHNU C [US], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13no. 509 (E-846)15. November 1989 & JP-A-01 206 828 ( TOSHIBA ) |