EP0504656 - Method and device for treating one side of plate-like articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Schmid GmbH & Co. Robert-Bosch-Strasse 34 D-72250 Freudenstadt / DE | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Dieter C. Am Schäferstich 19 W-7290 Freudenstadt / DE | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103656.2 | 04.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | DE19914107464 | 08.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4107464 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504656 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504656 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05C9/04, B05C13/02, H05K13/00, H05K3/00 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
B05C13/02 (EP,US);
B05C9/04 (EP,US);
H05K13/0061 (EP,US);
H05K3/0085 (EP,US);
Y10S134/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum einseitigen Behandeln von plattenförmigen Gegenständen | [1992/39] | English: | Method and device for treating one side of plate-like articles | [1992/39] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le traitement d'un côté de produits en plaque | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.07.1996 | NL | 24.07.1996 | BE | 31.03.1997 | LU | 31.03.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | IT | 24.07.1996 | |
NL | 24.07.1996 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/06] | IT | 24.07.1996 | |
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.07.1996 | |
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | BE | 31.03.1997 | |
Former [1997/24] | BE | 24.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3610397 (BOK HENDRIK F); | [X]DE3047578 (SETEK M KK [JP]); | [X]US4949665 (WEBER ERICH [DE]) |