EP0504673 - Process for the extracellular preparation of high molecular weight homopolysaccharides and their use, as well as the corresponding fungus strains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2011 | New entry: Biological material | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINTERSHALL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 10 40 20 D-34112 Kassel / DE | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sewe, Kai-Udo, Dr. Zuckmayerstrasse 6 W-2847 Barnstorf / DE | 02 /
Wagner, Fritz, Prof. Dr. Hohe Wiese 2 W-3300 Braunschweig-Stoeckheim / DE | 03 /
Prokop, Andreas Dr. Bueltenweg 91 W-3300 Braunschweig / DE | 04 /
Olszewski, Egon Gemeindestrasse 12 W-3300 Braunschweig-Rautheim / DE | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Karau, Wolfgang, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Karau, Wolfgang, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103803.0 | 06.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | DE19914109457 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109457 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504673 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504673 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/04, C12N1/14, C08B37/00, // (C12N1/14;, C12R1:645),(C12P19/04;, C12R1:645) | [1992/39] | CPC: |
C12P19/04 (EP);
C12N1/145 (EP);
C12R2001/645 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur extrazellulären Herstellung von hochmolekularen Homopolysacchariden und zu ihrer Anwendung, sowie die entsprechenden Pilzstämme | [1992/39] | English: | Process for the extracellular preparation of high molecular weight homopolysaccharides and their use, as well as the corresponding fungus strains | [1992/39] | French: | Procédé de préparation extracellulaire d'homo-polysaccharides à haut poids moléculaire et leur application, ainsi que les souches de champignons correspondantes | [1992/39] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 24.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.03.1997 | DK | 06.03.1997 | GB | 06.03.1997 | [1998/40] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 06.03.1997 | |
GB | 06.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0271907 (WINTERSHALL AG [DE]); | [A]DE4012238 (WINTERSHALL AG [DE]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR HUMAN AND ANIMAL MYCOLOGY. SABOURAUDIA Bd. 15, 1977, Seiten 283 - 295; D.J. NIEDERPRUEM ET AL.: 'CONTROL OF EXTRACELLULAR SLIME ACCUMULATION IN MONOKARYONS AND RESULTANT DIKARYONS OF SCHIZOPHYLLUM COMMUNE' |