EP0503527 - Connection for telecommunication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsinger, Herbert Münchener Strasse 67 W-8150 Holzkirchen / DE | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103984.8 | 09.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | DE19914108446 | 15.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108446 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0503527 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503527 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/14, H02G3/16 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
H02G3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Anschluss von Telekommunikationsgeräten | [1992/38] | English: | Connection for telecommunication apparatus | [1992/38] | French: | Connexion pour appareil de télécommunication | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH385950 (WOERTZ OSKAR [CH]); | [A]GB1492961 (CRABTREE & CO LTD J A); | [A]FR2635922 (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]) |