EP0504706 - Heptandionate compounds of alkaline earth metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY BARIUM STRONTIUM GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Döllein, Günther Meitnerstrasse 7 W-3000 Hannover 61 / DE | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Dieter Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharma Deutschland GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1992/39] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharma Deutschland GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104036.6 | 10.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | DE19914108731 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108731 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504706 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504706 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/00, C07C49/12, C07C49/92 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
C07C49/92 (EP,US);
C07C45/77 (EP,US);
C23C16/404 (EP,US);
C23C16/408 (EP,US);
Y10S505/734 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Neuartige Erdalkalimetall-Heptandionat-Verbindungen | [1992/39] | English: | Heptandionate compounds of alkaline earth metals | [1992/39] | French: | Composés heptandionates des métaux terres alcalins | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 30.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4251233 (SIEVERS ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US3098863 (ROLF DESSAUER, et al); | [A]EP0055459 (RIKUUN ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 6, 10. Februar 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 50311M, N.P. KUZ'MINA ET AL.: 'Barium dipivaloylmethanate - starting compound for obtaining high temperature superconducting films by deposition from gas phase.' Seite 630 ;Spalte L ; | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 26, 1. Juli 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 258508X, M. LESKELA ET AL.: 'Thermoanalytical and mass spectrometric studies on volatile beta-diketone chelates.' Seite 786 ;Spalte L ; | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 6, 10. Februar 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 50311M, N.P. KUZ'MINA ET AL.: 'Barium dipivaloylmethanate - starting compound for obtaining high temperature superconducting films by deposition from gas phase.' Seite 630 ;Spalte L ; and Zh. Neorg. Khim. 1991, 36(11),2739-44 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 26, 1. Juli 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 258508X, M. LESKELA ET AL.: 'Thermoanalytical and mass spectrometric studies on volatile beta-diketone chelates.' Seite 786 ;Spalte L ; and Thermochim. Acta, 1991, 175(1), 91-8 |