EP0504720 - Fertilizer broadcaster [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreyer, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Am Amazonenwerk 7 W-4507 Hasbergen / DE | [1992/39] | Application number, filing date | 92104137.2 | 11.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | DE19914109416 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109416 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504720 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504720 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01C17/00 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
A01C17/00 (EP);
A01C17/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Schleuderdüngerstreuer | [1992/39] | English: | Fertilizer broadcaster | [1992/39] | French: | Epandeur d'engrais centrifuge | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.08.1995 | NL | 09.08.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/17] | GB | 09.08.1995 | |
Former [1996/30] | GB | 09.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3438711 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]); | [XD]EP0327941 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]); | [A]DE1180562 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H); | [A]GB2144021 (LELY NV C VAN DER) |