EP0515779 - Container cap with suspending means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vierboom, Werner Gartenholz 100 W-2070 Ahrensburg / DE | [1992/49] | Application number, filing date | 92104284.2 | 12.03.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | DE19914117220 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4117220 | [1992/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515779 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515779 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/24 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B65D47/0838 (EP);
B65D51/242 (EP);
B65D2255/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, LI, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Behälterkappe mit Aufhängevorrichtung | [1992/49] | English: | Container cap with suspending means | [1992/49] | French: | Fermeture de récipient avec dispositif de suspension | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9002585U ; | [A]EP0063648 ; | [A]DE3516890 ; | [A]EP0251590 |