EP0508155 - Process for microencapsulation of products emulsive in water but which are not thermoplastic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states WACKER-CHEMIE GMBH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eck, Herbert, Dr. Burg 11 W-8263 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Hopf, Heinrich Mehringer Strasse 49 a W-8263 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Fleischmann, Gerald, Dr. Carl-Bosch-Strasse 3 W-8263 Burghausen / DE | 04 /
Innertsberger, Ernst Marie-Eberth-Strasse 15 W-8263 Burghausen / DE | 05 /
Schmidlkofer, Jakob Ahornweg 3 W-8261 Mehring / DE | [1992/42] | Application number, filing date | 92104410.3 | 13.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | DE19914108286 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108286 | DE19914131939 | 25.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4131939 | [1992/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508155 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508155 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/04, C08L1/28 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
B01J13/043 (EP,US);
B01J13/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Mikroverkapselung von in Wasser emulgierbaren, nicht-thermoplastischen Stoffen | [1992/42] | English: | Process for microencapsulation of products emulsive in water but which are not thermoplastic | [1992/42] | French: | Procédé de microencapsulation de produits émulsionnables dans l'eau, non-thermoplastiques | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE739630 (FERDINAND SICHEL A G); | [A]EP0284790 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [A]EP0311873 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al); | [A]EP0327351 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) |