EP0505877 - Impurity doping method with adsorbed diffusion source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 136 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akamine, Tadao, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Naoto, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Aoko, Kenji, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104495.4 | 15.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | JP19910063323 | 27.03.1991 Original published format: JP 6332391 | JP19910113544 | 17.05.1991 Original published format: JP 11354491 | [1992/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0505877 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0505877 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/225, C30B31/02 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/2254 (EP,US);
H01L21/2225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/40] | Title | German: | Dotierungsverfahren mittels einer adsorbierten Diffusionsquelle | [1992/40] | English: | Impurity doping method with adsorbed diffusion source | [1992/40] | French: | Méthode de dopage à l'aide d'une source de diffusion adsorbée | [1992/40] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/27] | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.11.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0417457 [ ] (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]); | EP0413982 [ ] (NISHIZAWA JUNICHI [JP], et al); | EP0454055 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 56, no. 14, 2 April 1990NEW YORK US pages 1334 - 1335 J.NISHIZAWA ET AL. 'Ultrashallow,high doping of boron using molecular layer doping' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 138, no. 1, January 1991, MANCHESTERNEW HAMPSHIRE US pages 233 - 238 J.R.FLEMISH ET AL. 'Phosphorus doping of silicon using a solid planar diffusion source at reduced pressures' |