EP0504866 - Programmable controller processor with a removable function card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, INC. 1201 South Second Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, INC. 1201 South Second Street Milwaukee Wisconsin 53204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Floro, William E. 38248 Poplar Drive Willoughby, Ohio 44094 / US | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans, et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 60322 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Lippert, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104763.5 | 19.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | US19910674826 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: US 674826 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0504866 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0504866 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G05B19/12 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/346 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | G06K19/073 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Prozessor für ein programmierbares Steuergerät mit einer abnehmbaren Funktionskarte | [1992/39] | English: | Programmable controller processor with a removable function card | [1992/39] | French: | Processeur d'un appareil de commande programmable avec une carte amovible de fonction | [1992/39] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 17.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.05.1994 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4942534 (YOKOYAMA MASAHARU [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0237883 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0357361 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [A]EP0321325 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]); | [A]EP0356237 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [A]EP0314148 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2640783 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]) |