EP0506058 - Magnetic card reader/writer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | ||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yasuo, c/o OMRON CORPORATION Intellect. Prop. Center, 20 Igadera, Shimo-Kaiinji Nagaokakyo-City, Kyoto 617 / JP | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105236.1 | 26.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | JP19910026733U | 26.03.1991 Original published format: JP 2673391 U | [1997/23] |
Former [1993/02] | JP19910026733 | 26.03.1991 | |
JP19910026733U | 26.03.1991 | ||
Former [1992/45] | JP19910026733U | 26.03.1991 | |
Former [1992/40] | JP19910026733U | 26.03.1991 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506058 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506058 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06K1/12, G06K7/08 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
G06K1/125 (EP,US);
G06K7/084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/40] | G06K7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Lese-/Schreibvorrichtung für Magnetkarte | [1992/40] | English: | Magnetic card reader/writer | [1992/40] | French: | Dispositif de lecture/écriture de carte magnétique | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.1997 | BE | 04.06.1997 | CH | 04.06.1997 | DK | 04.06.1997 | ES | 04.06.1997 | GR | 04.06.1997 | IT | 04.06.1997 | LI | 04.06.1997 | NL | 04.06.1997 | PT | 04.09.1997 | SE | 04.09.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
DK | 04.06.1997 | ||
ES | 04.06.1997 | ||
GR | 04.06.1997 | ||
IT | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
DK | 04.06.1997 | ||
GR | 04.06.1997 | ||
IT | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
DK | 04.06.1997 | ||
IT | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
DK | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
DK | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 04.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62241178 ; | [A]EP0361296 (CGA HBS [FR]); | [Y]EP0387809 (TONAMI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING CO [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 112 (P-687)9 April 1988 & JP-A-62 241 178 ( OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO ) 21 October 1987, & JP62241178 A 19871021 |