EP0509297 - Transesophageal ultrasound probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fearnside, James 19 Vine Brook Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 02 /
Sudol, Wojtek 21 Knollwood Court Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105361.7 | 27.03.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | US19910686103 | 16.04.1991 Original published format: US 686103 | US19910686919 | 17.04.1991 Original published format: US 686919 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0509297 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/12, A61B8/08 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP);
A61B8/445 (EP);
A61B8/4461 (EP);
H01R13/5224 (EP);
H02G11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/43] | Title | German: | Transoesophageale Ultraschallsonde | [1992/43] | English: | Transesophageal ultrasound probe | [1992/43] | French: | Tête ultrasonique pour application transoesophagienne | [1992/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 01.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/28] | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0006623 ; | [Y]US3779234 ; | [XP]WO9202180 |