EP0508264 - Process for the arylation of olefines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bader, Axel, Dr. Heymannstrasse 40 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Arlt, Dieter, Prof. Dr. Rybniker Strasse 2 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Fiedel, Dietmar, Dr. Mutzbroicher Strasse 25a W-5068 Odenthal-Voiswinkel / DE | 04 /
Meier, Stefan, Dr. Obere Strasse 14 W-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1992/42] | Application number, filing date | 92105452.4 | 30.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | DE19914111653 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4111653 | DE19914111620 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4111620 | DE19914111657 | 10.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4111657 | [1992/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508264 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508264 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/32, C07C51/353, C07C67/343, C07C309/29, C07C309/32, C07C63/66, C07C69/76, C07C69/618 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
C07C303/32 (EP,US);
C07B37/04 (EP,US);
C07C63/66 (EP,US);
C07C67/343 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C303/32, C07C309/29 (US,EP);
C07C303/32, C07C309/32 (US,EP);
C07C67/343, C07C69/734 (EP,US);
C07C67/343, C07C69/76 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Arylierung von Olefinen | [1992/42] | English: | Process for the arylation of olefines | [1992/42] | French: | Procédé pour l'arylation d'oléfines | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2325302 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | [A]EP0405389 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) | [X] - BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN. Bd. 52, Nr. 9, September 1979, TOKYO JP Seiten 2609 - 2610; K. KIKUKAWA ET AL.: 'Reaction of Diazonium Salts with Transition Metalls. II. Palladium-catalyzed Arylation of Ethylene with Arenediazonium Salts' | [X] - TETRAHEDRON, (INCL. TETRAHEDRON REPORTS) Bd. 37, Nr. 1, 1981, OXFORD GB Seiten 31 - 36; K. KIKUKAWA ET AL.: 'Reaction of Diazonium Salts with Transition Metalls - III. Palladium(0)-Catalyzed Arylation of Unsaturated Compounds with Arenediazonium Salts' |