EP0512247 - Method for leaching gold and silver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorösch, Jürgen, Dr. Pfarrer-Sturmfels-Weg 5 W-6450 Hanau 7 / DE | 02 /
Ziegler, Annette Taunusstrasse 43 W-6050 Offenbach / DE | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92105566.1 | 01.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | DE19914114514 | 03.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4114514 | [1992/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512247 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512247 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512247 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/08 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
C22B11/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, PT, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Laugung von Gold und Silber | [1992/46] | English: | Method for leaching gold and silver | [1992/46] | French: | Procédé pour le lixiviation d'or et d'argent | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.02.1996 | AT | 01.04.1996 | SE | 31.05.1996 | [1997/42] |
Former [1997/14] | GB | 28.02.1996 | |
SE | 31.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 31.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU587850B (BENDIGO GOLD); | [XPD]DE4017899 |