EP0515800 - Mounting structure for mounting an instrument on a supporting member of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mita, Katsumi, c/o Kawagoe Koujou Pioneer Electronic Corp., 25-1 Aza Nishimachi Ooaza Yamada, Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/49] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105722.0 | 02.04.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | JP19910154084 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15408491 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515800 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
B60R11/0205 (EP,US);
B60R11/0211 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0005 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0047 (EP,US);
Y10T70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/49] | Title | German: | Einbau-Anordnung zum Einbau eines Gerätes auf ein Trägerteil eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1992/49] | English: | Mounting structure for mounting an instrument on a supporting member of a motor vehicle | [1992/49] | French: | Structure de montage pour fixer un appareil sur un élément de support d'un véhicule à moteur | [1992/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/16] | 25.11.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2153427 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]GB2203399 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH); | [AP]EP0453631 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) |