EP0496433 - Photoprotection compositions comprising chelating agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissett, Donald Lynn 3925 Dust Commander Drive Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US | 02 /
Bush, Rodney Dean 1778 Clayburn Circle Cincinnati, Ohio 45240 / US | 03 /
Chatterjee, Ranjit 5907 Gilmore Drive Fairfield, Ohio 45014 / US | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92106051.3 | 18.10.1988 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | US19870112576 | 22.10.1987 Original published format: US 112576 | US19880251910 | 04.10.1988 Original published format: US 251910 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0496433 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0496433 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496433 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/40, A61K7/42 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | Chelatbildner enthaltende Lichtschutzmittel | [1992/31] | English: | Photoprotection compositions comprising chelating agents | [1992/31] | French: | Compositions photoprotectrices contenant des agents chélatants | [1992/31] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88309741.2 / EP0313305 | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Request for further processing for: | 17.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.1999 | CH | 31.10.1999 | LI | 31.10.1999 | [2001/08] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 31.10.1999 | |
LI | 31.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59170011 ; | [Y]GB559089 (WELLCOME FOUND, et al); | [A]US2363778 (PEDERSEN CHARLES J); | [A]FR2267758 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [X]DE2517216 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]US4144325 (VOYT WALTER F); | [A]US4282216 (ROVEE D THOMAS, et al); | [Y]FR2596986 (SEDERMA SA [FR]) | [AD] - BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA vol. 847, no. C11, 1985, AMSTERDAM, NL; pages 82 - 89 A.C. DE MELLO FILHO ET AL.: 'Protection of mamalian cells by o-phenanthroline from lethal and DNA-damaging effects produced by active oxygen species' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 21 (C-263)(1744) 29 January 1985 & JP-A-59 170 011 ( POLA KASEI KOGYO K.K. ) 26 September 1984, & JP59170011 A 19840926 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 19, 11 May 1987, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 152172c, A.S. KAMAT ET AL.: 'Involvement of calcium and dipicolinic acid in the resistance of Bacillus cereus BIS-59 spores to UV and gamma radiation' & INT.J.RADIA.BIOL.RELAT. STUD.PHYS.; CHEM. MED. vol. 51, no. 1, 1987, pages 7 - 18 | [A] - SOAP, COSMETICS, CHEMICAL SPECIALTIES vol. 48, no. 8, NEW YORK, NY, US; page 40 42 H.GOLDSCHMIEDT 'Vitamin E in Cosmetics' | [A] - INORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 22, 1983, EASTON,PA, US; pages 2630 - 2634 M.G. PATCH ET AL.: 'Evaluation of Iron(III) N,N'-Ethylenebis(o-hydroxyphenyl )glycinate) as a Model for the Iron Binding Site in the Transferrins' | by applicant | US51446 | US54085 | US2798053 | US3256200 | US3755560 | US3988255 | US3989816 | US4000276 | US4017641 | US4098881 | US4130667 | US4144325 | US4185100 | US4248861 | US4254105 | US4264581 | EP0043738 | US4338293 | US4387089 | US4421769 | US4537776 | US4552872 | US4557934 | EP0166221 | US4579844 | JPS61143331 | US4603146 | JPS61215314 | JPS61215313 | US4663157 | US4708966 | US4999186 | - "Sunscreen and Suntan Products", DESIMONE, HANDBOOK OF NONPRESCRIPTION DRUGS, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, (1982), vol. 26, pages 499 - 511 | - GROVE; FORBES, "A Method for Evaluating the Photoprotection Action of Sunscreen Agents Against UV-A Radiation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 4, pages 15 - 24 | - LAW, BR. J. PHARMAC., (1977), vol. 59, no. 4, pages 591 - 597 | - KAIDBEY, J. INVEST. DERMATOLOGY, (1976), vol. 66, pages 153 - 156 | - GRUBER, CLINICAL PHARM. AND THERAPEUT., (1971), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 109 - 113 | - HART, COSMETICS AND TOILETRIES, (1978), vol. 93, no. 12, pages 28 - 30 | - HART, COSMETICS AND TOILETRIES, (1983), vol. 98, no. 4, pages 54 - 58 | - WOOLEY, BIOCHEM. J., (1978), vol. 169, pages 265 - 276 | - KLIGMAN, PHOTODERM., (1986), vol. 3, pages 215 - 227 | - DAVIES, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, no. 20, pages 9895 - 9901 | - BLACK, PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1987), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 213 - 221 | - BRAUGHLER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, no. 22, pages 10282 - 10289 | - NUNEZ, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 258, no. 2, pages 1146 - 1151 | - FILHO, BIOCHEM. ET BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1985), vol. 847, pages 82 - 89 | - MORGAN, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS, ACTA, (1983), vol. 733, no. 1, pages 39 - 50 | - ZIGLER, ARCH BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1985), vol. 241, no. 1, pages 163 - 172 | - TAUBER, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1977), vol. 60, pages 374 - 379 | - D. L. BISSETT; D. P. HANNON; T. V. ORR, "An Animal Model of Solar-Aged Skin: Histological, Physical, and Visible Changes in UV-Irradiated Hairless Mouse Skin", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1987), vol. 46, pages 367 - 378 | - BISSETT, PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (1987), vol. 46, pages 367 - 378 | - "Development of Iron Chelators for Clinical Use", MARTELL, A.E., THE DESIGN AND SYNTHESIS OF CHELATING AGENTS, ELSEVIER NORTH HOLLAND, INC., (1981), pages 67 - 104 | - KONTOGHIORGHES, G.J., "L1 - 1,2-dimethyl-3-hydroxypyrid-4-one", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1988), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 413 - 415 | - SAGARIN, COSMETICS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1972), vol. 2, pages 443 - 465 | - SAGARIN, COSMETICS, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1972), vol. 1, pages 32 - 43 | - SEGARIN, COSMETICS. SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1972), vol. 1, pages 72 - 73 | - MCCUTCHEON'S DETERGENTS AND EMULSIFIERS, (1986), pages 317 - 324 | - SEGARIN, COSMETICS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, page 189 | - K. D. RAINSFORD, ANTI- INFLAMMATORY AND ANTI-RHEUMATIC DRUGS, CRC PRESS, (1985), vol. I-III | - R. A. SCHERRER, ANTI-INFLAMMATORY AGENTS, CHEMISTRY AND PHARMACOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1974), vol. 1 | US19870022876 |