EP0510452 - A knowledge base management system for an information reasoning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibao, Kouichi, c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind. Ltd. 3 Chigusa Kaigran Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Osada, Yukinori, c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind. Ltd. 3 Chigusa Kaigran Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Makoto, c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind. Ltd. 3 Chigusa Kaigran Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Nishimura, Tadashi, c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind. Ltd 3 Chigusa Kaigran Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92106152.9 | 09.04.1992 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | JP19910095858 | 25.04.1991 Original published format: JP 9585891 | JP19910097750 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: JP 9775091 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0510452 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0510452 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510452 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F17/30, G06F17/60 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
G06N5/022 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1992/44] | G06F9/44, G06F15/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/44] | Title | German: | Wissensbasis-Managementsystem für eine Informations-Schlussfolgerungsvorrichtung | [1998/34] | English: | A knowledge base management system for an information reasoning apparatus | [1992/44] | French: | Système de gestion d'une base de connaissances pour un dispositif de raisonnement informatique | [1992/44] |
Former [1992/44] | Wissensbasis-Verwaltungssystem für eine Nachrichten-Schlussfolgerungsvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 21.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.08.1998 | [2008/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP04084333 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 308 (P-1381)7 July 1992 & JP-A-04 084333 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 17 March 1992, & JP04084333 A 19920317 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE vol. 36, no. 6, December 1989, NEW YORK, NY, US pages 2450 - 2458 JOON ON YANG ET AL 'A Diagnostic Expert System for the Nuclear Power Plant based on the Hybrid Knowledge Approach' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL IEEE CONFERENCE ON TOOLS FOR ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE 9 November 1990, HERNDON, VA, US pages 792 - 796 YONG-QING CHENG ET AL 'A Knowledge-Based Graphic Description Tool for Understanding Engineering Drawings' |