EP0508462 - Microelectronic device incorporating an improved packaging scheme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiu, Anthony M. 2563 Buttercup Drive Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | 02 /
Baudouin, Daniel A. 2218 Hilton Head Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92106255.0 | 10.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | US19910685239 | 12.04.1991 Original published format: US 685239 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508462 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508462 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/485, H01L23/482, H01L23/50 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
H01L23/4951 (EP);
H01L21/60 (KR);
H01L23/4985 (EP);
H01L27/04 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/42] | H01L23/495 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/42] | Title | German: | Mikroelektronische Anordnung mit verbessertem Verpackungsschema | [1992/42] | English: | Microelectronic device incorporating an improved packaging scheme | [1992/42] | French: | Dispositif microélectronique avec un schéma d'emballage | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP03011643 ; | [X]JP01007645 ; | [Y]JP01007645 ; | [Y]JP59139636 ; | [X]US5068712 (MURAKAMI GEN [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0433695 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 125 (E-1050)27 March 1991 & JP-A-03 011 643 ( HITACHI LTD ) 18 January 1991, & JP03011643 A 19910118 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 181 (E-750)27 April 1989 & JP-A-01 007 645 ( HITACHI LTD ) 11 January 1989, & JP01007645 A 19890111 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 181 (E-750)27 April 1989 & JP-A-01 007 645 ( HITACHI LTD ) 11 January 1989, & JP01007645 A 19890111 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 268 (E-283)7 December 1984 & JP-A-59 139 636 ( MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK ) 10 August 1984, & JP59139636 A 19840810 |