EP0510498 - Catalytic reactor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | ||
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lachman, Irwin Morris, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 02 /
Patil, Mallanagouda Dyamanagouda, Corning Inc. Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 03 /
Swaroop, Srinivas Hosdurg, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | 04 /
Williams, Jimmie Lewis, Corning Incorporated Patent Department, SP FR 02-12 Corning, NY 14831 / US | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92106471.3 | 15.04.1992 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | US19910688967 | 22.04.1991 Original published format: US 688967 | US19920856848 | 30.03.1992 Original published format: US 856848 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510498 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510498 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/56, B01D53/94, B01D53/88 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
F01N3/28 (EP,US);
B01D53/38 (KR);
B01D53/9472 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N13/017 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/44] | B01D53/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/44] | Title | German: | Katalytisches Reaktorsystem | [1992/44] | English: | Catalytic reactor system | [1992/44] | French: | Système de réacteur catalytique | [1992/44] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.01.1997 | BE | 29.01.1997 | ES | 29.01.1997 | FR | 29.01.1997 | IT | 29.01.1997 | NL | 29.01.1997 | SE | 29.04.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 29.01.1997 | |
BE | 29.01.1997 | ||
ES | 29.01.1997 | ||
IT | 29.01.1997 | ||
NL | 29.01.1997 | ||
SE | 29.04.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 29.01.1997 | |
BE | 29.01.1997 | ||
ES | 29.01.1997 | ||
IT | 29.01.1997 | ||
SE | 29.04.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.01.1997 | |
BE | 29.01.1997 | ||
IT | 29.01.1997 | ||
SE | 29.04.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 29.01.1997 | |
BE | 29.01.1997 | ||
SE | 29.04.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 29.01.1997 | |
BE | 29.01.1997 | ||
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | AT | 29.01.1997 | |
FR | 27.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 29.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3599427 (JONES JAMES H, et al); | [XD]US3767764 (DOLBEAR G); | [X]US3825654 (KOBYLINSKI T, et al); | [X]DE3608292 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [X]EP0369576 (CORNING INC [US]) |