EP0565764 - Lighted advertising sign [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUBLIMOTION S.r.l. Via A. da Mostro, 7 37138 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states PUBLIMOTION S.r.l. Via A. da Mostro, 7 I-37138 Verona / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castellaro, Fulvio Via Sant'Ambrogio, 13 I-10139 Torino / IT | 02 /
Ghigliotti, Aldo Via Carmagnola, 60 I-10046 Poirino / IT | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Aprà, Mario Aprà Brevetti Via Bertola 2 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92106718.7 | 17.04.1992 | [1993/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565764 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/18 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/0026 (EP);
G02B6/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Leuchtwerbeschild | [1993/42] | English: | Lighted advertising sign | [1993/42] | French: | Enseigne publicitaire lumineuse | [1993/42] | File destroyed: | 06.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/01] | 10.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.05.1994 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE652165 [ ]; | CH293325 [ ]; | FR999013 [ ]; | US4949489 [ ]; | FR2451608 [ ] |