EP0512320 - Solid dye preparations with improved water solubility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stawitz, Josef-Walter, Dr. Am Hagen 1 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Stöhr, Frank-Michael, Dr. Am Thelen Siefen 10 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Wolff, Joachim, Dr. Schlinghovener Strasse 38 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92106850.8 | 22.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | DE19914114587 | 04.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4114587 | [1992/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512320 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/24 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
C09B67/0072 (EP,US);
F02M26/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1992/46] | Title | German: | Feste Farbstoffpräparationen mit verbesserter Wasserlöslichkeit | [1992/46] | English: | Solid dye preparations with improved water solubility | [1992/46] | French: | Préparations solides de colorants de solubilité améliorée dans l'eau | [1992/46] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60226559 ; | [X]GB880393 (CIBA LTD); | [X]CH482000 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [X]DE1127324 (CIBA GEIGY); | [AD]US4802888 (SANDEFUR CHARLES W [US], et al); | [A]EP0024654 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0255890 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]FR2388027 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [A] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=85-321670 [51], Derwent Publications Ltd. , London, GB; &JP-A-60-226559 (Nippon Kayaku KK) 11-11-1985 * Zusammenfassung *, & JP60226559 A 00000000 |