EP0512338 - A pattern development system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerber Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland Connecticut 06084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Gerber Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | ||
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states Gerber Garment Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarino, Thomas N. 330 Thompson Street East Haven, Connecticut 06513 / US | 02 /
Altshul, Mary McFadden 2 Shadbush Lane South Windsor, Connecticut 06074 / US | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/45] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/46] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107032.2 | 24.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | US19910694666 | 02.05.1991 Original published format: US 694666 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512338 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512338 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512338 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0512338 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A41H3/00, G06F17/50 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
A41H3/007 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/46] | A41H3/00, G06F15/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/04] |
Former [1992/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Musterentwicklungssystem | [1992/46] | English: | A pattern development system | [1992/46] | French: | Système de développement de formes | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 25.05.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU, MC | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lectra Systems Chemin du Marticot 33611 Cestas Cédex / FR Opponent's representative Joly, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Lectra Systems Chemin du Marticot 33611 Cestas Cédex / FR Opponent's representative Joly, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | 27.11.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.05.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.06.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.06.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.02.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.1992 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1992 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.1992 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | 26.06.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.07.1992 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4943689 ; | [AD]US4058849 (FITZGERALD WILLIAM JOSEPH, et al); | [Y]EP0182144 (PENCEPT INC [US]); | [Y]EP0332765 (TAKENAKA CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0338964 (ADVANCED SCIENT TECHNOLOGIES E [ES]) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI Week 9032, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-246678 & US-A-4 943 689 (SIEFER ET AL), & US4943689 A 00000000 | [XP] - MANUFACTURING CLOTHIER vol. 72, no. 10, October 1991, LONDON GB pages 9 - 12 D.H. BARNES 'CAD Developments' |