EP0567679 - Load-bearing foot for raised floors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIROSS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION B.V. Museumplein 11 1071 DJ Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states HIROSS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION B.V. Museumplein 11 NL-1071 DJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states HIROSS S.p.A. Via L. da Vinci, Zona Industriale Tognana I-35028 Piove di Sacco Prov. Padova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiericati, Giangiorgio Via Contra, S. Antonio, 3 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | 02 /
Biasiolo, Giuliano Via Bragni, 31 I-35010 Cadoneghe (Prov. Padova) / IT | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn. Dorotheergasse 7/14 A-1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1993/44] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92107374.8 | 30.04.1992 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567679 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/024, F16B17/00 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
F16B17/006 (EP);
E04F15/0247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/44] | Title | German: | Lasttragender Fuss für Doppelböden | [1993/44] | English: | Load-bearing foot for raised floors | [1993/44] | French: | Pied porte-charges pour faux planchers surélevés | [1993/44] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/38] | 02.05.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.06.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   25.07.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2186079 ; | [Y]EP0325051 ; | [A]DE425879 ; | [A]US2570282 ; | [A]FR2624495 |