EP0513634 - High-speed film-forming processes by plasma CVD and Radical CVD under high pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori, Yuzo 8-16-19, Kisaichi Katano-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states UHA MIKAKUTO PRECISION ENGINEERING RESEARCH INSTITUTE Co., Ltd. 4-12, Kanzaki-cho, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states Mori, Yuzo 16-9, 8-chome Kisaichi Katano-shi Osaka 576 / JP | ||
For all designated states UHA MIKAKUTO PRECISION ENGINEERING RESEARCH INSTITUTE Co., Ltd. 4-12, Kanzaki-cho, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Yuzo 16-9 Kisaichi 8-chome Katano-shi, Osaka 576 / JP | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/47] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107566.9 | 05.05.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | JP19910139750 | 14.05.1991 Original published format: JP 13975091 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0513634 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0513634 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44, C23C16/50, H01J37/34 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
H01J37/32256 (EP);
C23C16/452 (EP);
H01J37/32357 (EP);
H01J2237/3326 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/47] | C23C16/44, C23C16/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/47] | Title | German: | Schnelle Filmbildungsverfahren mittels durch Plasma und Radicale unterstütztes CVD bei hohem Druck | [1992/47] | English: | High-speed film-forming processes by plasma CVD and Radical CVD under high pressure | [1992/47] | French: | Procédés à haute vitesse de formation de films par CVD assisté par plasma et radicaux à haute pression | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 15.03.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPS6141763 ; | [XA]US4951602 (KANAI M) [X] 1-5,9 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 13; example 3 * [A] 6-8,10-15; | [YA]JPS61278131 ; | [YA]JPS62278263 ; | [A]EP0422243 (CANON KK) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [A]JPH0285368 ; | [A]JPS63243277 ; | [A]US5010276 (ECHIZEN ET AL) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPH01238020 ; | [A]EP0237078 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860711), vol. 010, no. 199, Database accession no. (C - 359), & JP61041763 A 19860228 (ANELVA CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * abstract * [A] 8-15 [Y] 6,7 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870502), vol. 011, no. 138, Database accession no. (E - 503), & JP61278131 A 19861209 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE & TECHNOL;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 1-5,7-15 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880521), vol. 012, no. 172, Database accession no. (C - 497), & JP62278263 A 19871203 (CANON INC) [Y] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-6,8-15 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900618), vol. 014, no. 280, Database accession no. (C - 0729), & JP02085368 A 19900326 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890203), vol. 013, no. 049, Database accession no. (C - 565), & JP63243277 A 19881011 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891215), vol. 013, no. 568, Database accession no. (E - 861), & JP01238020 A 19890922 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |