EP0512482 - Process for reducing the formation of coke in the thermal treating of synthetic organic refuse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RWE Entsorgung Aktiengesellschaft Bamlerstrasse 61 45141 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states RWE Entsorgung Aktiengesellschaft Bamlerstrasse 61 D-45141 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammer, Hartmut, Dr. Leyboldstrasse 21 W-5000 Köln 51 / DE | 02 /
Winkler, Dieter, Dr. Tiefgasse 50 D-53945 Mülheim bei Blankenheim / DE | 03 /
Jakubik, Dieter, Dr. Wilhelminenstrasse 1 a W-4330 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | 04 /
Rauser, Gerd, Dr. Liebigstrasse 16 W-5047 Wesseling / DE | [1994/23] |
Former [1992/46] | 01 /
Hammer, Hartmut, Dr. Leyboldstrasse 21 W-5000 Köln 51 / DE | ||
02 /
Winkler, Dieter, Dr. Max-Ernststrasse 7 W-5047 Wesseling / DE | |||
03 /
Jakubik, Dieter, Dr. Wilhelminenstrasse 1 a W-4330 Mülheim a. d. Ruhr / DE | |||
04 /
Rauser, Gerd, Dr. Liebigstrasse 16 W-5047 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107587.5 | 05.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | DE19914114434 | 03.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4114434 | [1992/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512482 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512482 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/02 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
C10G1/10 (EP);
C10G1/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/46] | C10G1/00, C10G1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung der Koksbildung bei der thermischen Behandlung synthetischer, organischer Abfälle | [1992/46] | English: | Process for reducing the formation of coke in the thermal treating of synthetic organic refuse | [1992/46] | French: | Procédé por diminuer le dépôt de coke dans le traitement thermique de déchets organiques synthétiques | [1992/46] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]CH678335 ; | [AD]EP0236701 |