EP0512499 - Device for removal of injection needles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pajunk, Horst Am Holzplatz 5-9 W-7716 Geisingen / DE | 02 /
Pajunk, Heinrich Am Holzplatz 5-9 W-7716 Geisingen / DE | 03 /
Loos, Hans-Joachim An der Schleuse 5 W-6095 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg / DE | 04 /
Ziegert, Günter Loreleistrasse 34 W-6230 Frankfurt am Main 80 / DE | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92107630.3 | 06.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | DE19914115024 | 08.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4115024 | [1992/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512499 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
A61M5/3205 (EP);
A61M2005/3208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL, PT [1992/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entsorgen von Injektionskanülen | [1992/46] | English: | Device for removal of injection needles | [1992/46] | French: | Dispositif pour l'enlèvement d'aiguilles hypodermiques | [1992/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 18.05.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4989307 ; | [A]EP0313212 ; | [A]US4807344 ; | [A]DE8711864U |