EP0514730 - Automatically configurable, piggable pipework system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wedemann, Ernst Kampchaussee 41b D-21033 Hamburg / DE | [1992/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/48] | Representative(s) | Heldt, Gert Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwalt Holstenwall 10 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Neuer Wall 59 III D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107871.3 | 08.05.1992 | [1992/48] | Priority number, date | DE19914115492 | 11.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4115492 | [1992/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0514730 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/52, B65G53/06, F17D3/08 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
B65G53/521 (EP);
B65G53/06 (EP);
F17D3/08 (EP);
B05B12/1481 (EP);
B65G2201/0291 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/48] | Title | German: | Automatisch konfigurierbares molchbares Rohrleitungssystem | [1992/48] | English: | Automatically configurable, piggable pipework system | [1992/48] | French: | Système de tuyau automatiquement configurable et raclable | [1992/48] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/16] | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2628811 ; | [Y]FR2650650 ; | [Y]DE1750787 ; | [Y]EP0375533 |