EP0512572 - Optical isolator and method for fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohkawara, Kazuhide c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92107893.7 | 11.05.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | JP19910105842 | 10.05.1991 Original published format: JP 10584291 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512572 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512572 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512572 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/09 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
G02F1/093 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US);
Y10S372/703 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/46] | Title | German: | Optischer Isolator und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1992/46] | English: | Optical isolator and method for fabricating the same | [1992/46] | French: | Isolateur optique et son procédé de fabrication | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 13.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01200223 ; | [XP]JP04000410 ; | [A]GB2217508 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 499 (P-957)10 November 1989 & JP-A-01 200 223 ( FUJI ELECTROCHEM. ) 11 August 1989, & JP01200223 A 19890811 | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS vol. 25, no. 2, January 1986, NEW YORK pages 311 - 314 K. SHIRAISHI: 'Microisolator' | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 139 (P-1334)8 April 1992 & JP-A-04 000 410 ( SHIN ETSU CHEM. ) 6 January 1992, & JP04000410 A 19920106 |