EP0521281 - A method of face sealing passages in ceramic support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohr, Franz Josef, Dr. Forstweg 2 W-6941 Abtsteinach / DE | 02 /
Hug, Kuno Steinbachweg 14 W-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Stadelmann, Heinz, Dr. Im Schilling 16 W-6906 Leimen / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108439.8 | 19.05.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914116736 | 23.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4116736 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521281 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/00, B28B21/42 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B28B11/006 (EP);
C04B37/001 (EP);
C04B2237/32 (EP);
C04B2237/52 (EP);
C04B2237/76 (EP);
C04B35/645 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur stirnseitigen Abdichtung von Kanälen in einem keramischen Träger | [1993/01] | English: | A method of face sealing passages in ceramic support | [1993/01] | French: | Procédé pour étancher frontal des passages dans un support en céramique | [1993/01] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/11] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0376579 ; | [X]DE2715852 ; | [A]DE2346270 ; | [A]DE3937667 ; | [X]DE539680 ; | [A]DE1683839 ; | [X]JPH01192504 | [X] - E. KRAUSE ET AL 'TECHNOLOGIE DER KERAMIK. BAND 2: MECHANISCHE PROZESSE' 1988 , VEB VERLAG F]R BAUWESEN , ALTENBURGDD | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13no. 485 (M-887)(3833) 6. November 1989 & JP-A-1 192 504 ( IBIDEN CO LTD ) 2. August 1989 |