EP0516012 - pitched roofs assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/49] | Insulation board for pitched roofs | ||
[1997/12] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW ITALIA S.P.A. Via Patroclo 21 20151 Milano / IT | [1996/05] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states DOW ITALIA S.P.A. Via Murat, 23/25 I-20159 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vitturi, Carlo 61, Viale IV Novembre I-30100 S. Elena (Venezia) / IT | 02 /
Guidetti, Flavio 6, Via San Francesco I-42015 Correggio, (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Sgarbi, Renato, et al Giambrocono & C. s.p.a. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Sgarbi, Renato, et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1992/49] | Sgarbi, Renato, et al GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit, 34 I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | Application number, filing date | 92108770.6 | 25.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00474U | 30.05.1991 Original published format: IT MI910474 U | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0516012 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516012 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/20, E04D13/16 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
E04B7/225 (EP);
E04D13/172 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/49] | Title | German: | Assemblage für Steildächer | [1997/12] | English: | pitched roofs assembly | [1997/12] | French: | assemblage pour toits inclinés | [1997/12] |
Former [1992/49] | Isolierplatte für Steildächer | ||
Former [1992/49] | Insulation board for pitched roofs | ||
Former [1992/49] | Panneau isolant pour toits inclinés | Examination procedure | 06.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.1997
15.05.1998
WITHDRAWN BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02
08.12.1997
13.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DI-BI S.p.A. 6, Via Sacco e Vanzetti 42021 Ghiardo di Bibbiano (Reggio Emilia) / IT Opponent's representative Corradini, Corrado Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | 03
11.12.1997
30.07.1998
WITHDRAWN LAPE S.R.L. Via G. Di Vittorio 1/3 Zona Ind. Terrafino 50053 Empoli (Firenze) / IT Opponent's representative Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.1997
15.05.1998
WITHDRAWN BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
08.12.1997
13.01.1998
ADMISSIBLE DI-BI S.p.A. 6, Via Sacco e Vanzetti 42021 Ghiardo di Bibbiano (Reggio Emilia) / IT Opponent's representative Corradini, Corrado Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | |||
03
11.12.1997
30.07.1998
WITHDRAWN LAPE S.R.L. Via G. Di Vittorio 1/3 Zona Ind. Terrafino 50053 Empoli (Firenze) / IT Opponent's representative Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | |||
Former [1998/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.11.1997
15.05.1998
WITHDRAWN BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 29.01.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.07.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.10.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/26] | 12.10.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.12.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 12.01.2001 | Appeal received No. T0082/01 | 02.04.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1609986 ; | [A]DE2519459 | [A] - CAHIERS DU CENTRE SCIENTIFIQUE ET TECHNIQUE DU BâTIMENT no. 232, September 1982, PARIS (FR) pages 1 - 5; CSTB: 'Avis technique nØ 5/81-379; WELL-ALGOSTAT' 2. description | [A] - AEROBORD May 1976, ASKEATON (GB) pages 1 - 3; SOUTHERN CHEMICALS LTD: 'Inverted roof system' | Examination | DE2349710 |