EP0516056 - Facsimile apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazuya, Ijuin, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Michio, Kasuya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shinnichiro, Otsuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/49] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92108867.0 | 26.05.1992 | [1992/49] | Priority number, date | JP19910152289 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15228991 | [1992/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516056 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516056 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516056 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
H04N1/00554 (EP,US);
H04N1/00519 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/49] | Title | German: | Faksimilegerät | [1992/49] | English: | Facsimile apparatus | [1992/49] | French: | Dispositif de fac-similé | [1992/49] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 26.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4754337 (NOHTOMI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0299437 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US4895288 (KOTANI MATAHIRA [JP], et al); | [A]EP0364827 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]DE4004418 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK [JP]); | [X]EP0416596 (SHARP KK [JP]) |