EP0517159 - Arrangement of a front panel for a household appliance, in particular for a dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/50] | Arrangement of a front panel for a household appliance, in particular for a dishwasher comprising a front door pivotable about a horizontal axis | ||
[1995/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states bulthaup GmbH & Co. Küchensysteme D-84153 Aich / DE | [1995/03] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states BULTHAUP GmbH & Co. D-84155 Bodenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackenberger, Hermann Ringstrasse 8 W-8318 Vilsbiburg / DE | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | May, Hans Ulrich Patentanwalt Dr.H.U.May, Thierschstrasse 27 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | May, Hans Ulrich, Dr. Patentanwalt Dr.H.U.May, Thierschstrasse 27 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109287.0 | 02.06.1992 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | DE19910006897U | 05.06.1991 Original published format: DE 9106897 U | [1992/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517159 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517159 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, F24C15/02 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
A47L15/4265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1992/50] | Title | German: | Anordnung einer Vorsatzplatte an einem Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere einer Geschirrspülmaschine | [1995/29] | English: | Arrangement of a front panel for a household appliance, in particular for a dishwasher | [1995/29] | French: | Disposition d'un panneau d'habillage pour un appareil ménager, notamment un lave-vaisselle | [1995/29] |
Former [1992/50] | Anordnung einer Vorsatzplatte an einem Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere einer Geschirrspülmaschine, mit einer frontseitigen, um eine horizontal verlaufende Achse schwenkbaren Tür | ||
Former [1992/50] | Arrangement of a front panel for a household appliance, in particular for a dishwasher comprising a front door pivotable about a horizontal axis | ||
Former [1992/50] | Disposition d'un panneau d'habillage pour un appareil ménager, notamment un lave-vaisselle comportant une porte frontale pivotante autour d'un axe horizontal | Examination procedure | 01.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.07.1995 | ES | 19.07.1995 | FR | 19.07.1995 | IT | 19.07.1995 | NL | 19.07.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
ES | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
NL | 19.07.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
ES | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/19] | FR | 15.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2716952 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]DE2937440 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]FR2576497 (ROUX SA EXPLOIT [FR]); | [A]DE8629845U |