EP0523361 - Pipe with ribs and method for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gesellschaft für Innenhochdruckverfahren mbH & Co.KG Ulmer Strasse 101 D-73431 Aalen / DE | [1995/11] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states GESENKSCHMIEDE SCHNEIDER GMBH Ulmer Strasse 112 D-73431 Aalen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bögel, Helmut Gabelsbergerstrasse 10 W-7080 Alen / DE | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/03] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia, Dr. Rauchstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109318.3 | 02.06.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | DE19914123559 | 16.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123559 | [1993/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0523361 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21D15/10, F16L9/04, F16L9/12 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
B21D15/10 (EP);
F16L9/04 (EP);
F16L9/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1993/03] | Title | German: | Rohr mit Rippen und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1993/03] | English: | Pipe with ribs and method for making the same | [1993/03] | French: | Tube avec des nervures et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 29.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/25] | Request for further processing for: | 18.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.1997 | Decision despatched | 30.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 21.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 30.06.1997 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2780273 (ROBERTS FRED T); | [X]DE1002423 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]GB772134 (RODOLFO DEBENEDETTI); | [X]GB839373 (FLEXONICS CORP); | [A]CH369094 (TECALEMIT SA [FR]); | [A]US3130771 (PEYTON JOHN F); | [X]DE1753632 (TUBOFLEX KG FRITZ BERGHOEFER &); | [A]DE2118207 ; | [A]DE2557215 (MIRTSCH FRANK DIPL ING DIPL PH); | [X]WO8701978 (SCHNEIDER GESENKSCHMIEDE [DE]); | [X]EP0250838 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |