EP0503685 - Radiant electric heaters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceramaspeed Limited Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich, Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states Ceramaspeed Limited Hadzor Hall Hadzor Droitwich, Worcestershire WR9 7DJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McWilliams, Kevin Ronald 9 College Mews Stratford-upon-Avon, Warwickshire / GB | 02 /
Higgins, George Anthony 5 Broadwaters Drive, Hagley Stourbridge, West Midlands / GB | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Haven Plough Road Tibberton Droitwich Worcestershire WR9 7NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92109344.9 | 19.05.1989 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | GB19880012600 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812600 | GB19880022119 | 20.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8822119 | GB19880030118 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8830118 | GB19890000777 | 13.01.1989 Original published format: GB 8900777 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503685 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503685 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503685 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74, H05B3/46, H05B3/32 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
H05B3/744 (EP,US);
H05B3/742 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/38] | H05B3/74, F24C15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Elektrische Strahlungsheizgeräte | [1992/38] | English: | Radiant electric heaters | [1992/38] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage électrique par rayonnement | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89305088.0 / EP0343868 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.03.1996
30.04.1996
ADMISSIBLE E.G.O. Elektro-Geräte Blanc und Fischer GmbH & Co.KG Rote-Tor-Strasse 14 75038 Oberderdingen / DE Opponent's representative Beier, Joachim Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/20] | 06.05.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.11.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 06.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 25.12.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4493977 (ARAI TETSUJI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3406604 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]US4535228 (MIMURA YOSHIKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0206597 (MICROPORE INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]); | [A]DE8502949U ; | [A]DE3619919 (THERMAL QUARZ SCHMELZE GMBH [DE]) |