EP0518219 - Capacitor and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Kazufumi 30-5, Higashi Nakafuri 1-chome Hirakata-shi 573, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Soga, Mamoru 1-22, Saikudani 1-chome, Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi 543, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Mino, Norihisa 4-6-8-806, Senrioka Higashi Settsu-shi 566, Osaka / JP | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109484.3 | 04.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | JP19910143498 | 14.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14349891 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518219 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518219 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518219 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/14, H01G4/20 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H01G4/206 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/435 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/51] | Title | German: | Kondensator und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1992/51] | English: | Capacitor and method of manufacturing the same | [1992/51] | French: | Condensateur et son procédé de fabrication | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62221103 ; | [A]GB1316144 (MALLORY & CO INC P R); | [A]EP0097945 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0282188 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0452955 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8744, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A, AN 87-311235 & JP-A-62 221 103 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND KK) 29 September 1987, & JP62221103 A 19870929 |