EP0518285 - Circuit for a volume flow measuring device used for a medium flowing in a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer & Porter GmbH Postfach 1843 Dransfelder Strasse 2 D-37079 Göttingen / DE | [1992/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nissen Peter, Dr. Birkenweg 1 W-3405 Rosdorf / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Klaus Lug ins Land 26 W-3510 Hann. Münden / DE | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Fincke, Karl Theodor, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109735.8 | 10.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | DE19914119372 | 12.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4119372 | [1992/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518285 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518285 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,US);
G01F1/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL [1992/51] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für eine Vorrichtung zur Messung des Volumenstroms eines ein Rohr durchfliessenden Mediums | [1992/51] | English: | Circuit for a volume flow measuring device used for a medium flowing in a pipe | [1992/51] | French: | Circuit pour un dispositif de mesure du débit volumétrique d'un milieu en écoulement dans un tube | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0219725 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]); | [AD]DE2743954 (FISCHER & PORTER GMBH); | [AP]DE4010728 (FISCHER & PORTER GMBH [DE]) |