EP0528131 - Fiber-reinforced composites having having continuously varied fibre density across the month of the base layer, and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Chihiro, c/o Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Ind., Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1993/08] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92109856.2 | 11.06.1992 | [1993/08] | Priority number, date | JP19910233873 | 21.08.1991 Original published format: JP 23387391 | [1993/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0528131 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0528131 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/14, C04B35/80 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
B32B5/14 (EP,US);
B32B5/145 (US);
C04B35/593 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
B32B2262/105 (US);
B32B2262/106 (US);
B32B2307/306 (US);
C04B2111/00405 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2237/36 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/368 (EP,US);
C04B2237/38 (EP,US);
C04B2237/385 (EP,US);
C04B2237/58 (EP,US);
C04B2237/66 (EP,US);
C04B2237/704 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/08] | Title | German: | Faserverstärkter Verbundwerkstoff mit über der Breite der Basisschicht stufenlos veränderter Faserdichte, und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1993/08] | English: | Fiber-reinforced composites having having continuously varied fibre density across the month of the base layer, and manufacturing method thereof | [1993/08] | French: | Matières composites renforcées par des fibres ayant une densité de fibres variant sans discontinuité dans l'épaisseur de la couche de base, et procédé de fabrication | [1993/08] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 09.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60190545 ; | [A]JP1033077 ; | [A]US4391873 (BRASSELL GILBERT W, et al); | [A]DE8801481U ; | [A]EP0355916 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]US4992318 (GADKAREE KISHOR P [US]); | [A]GB2239214 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 043 (C-329)20 February 1986 & JP-A-60 190 545 ( MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO KK ) 28 September 1985, & JP60190545 A 19850928 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 8911, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 89-081092 & JP-A-1 033 077 (TOYO KOGYO KK) 2 February 1989, & JP1033077 A 19890202 |