EP0519376 - Binder resins for making fibre composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/52] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesse, Wolfgang, Dr. Rossbachhöhe 42 W-6204 Taunusstein / DE | 02 /
Leicht, Erhard, Dr. Kurhausstrasse 56 W-6238 Hofheim / DE | 03 /
Sattelmeyer, Richard, Dr. Gabelsbornstrasse 32 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 04 /
Schäfer, Ralph Mecklenburger Strasse 55 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1992/52] | Application number, filing date | 92110060.8 | 15.06.1992 | [1992/52] | Priority number, date | DE19914120582 | 21.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4120582 | [1992/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0519376 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0519376 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0519376 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G8/28, C08K5/00, C08K5/06, C08K5/09, C08K5/10 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
C08L61/04 (EP,US);
C08L61/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08G8/08 (EP,US);
C08G8/28 (EP,US);
C08L99/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L61/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/52] | C08G8/28, C08G8/08, C08L67/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/37] |
Former [1992/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bindemittelharze zur Herstellung von Faserverbunden | [1992/52] | English: | Binder resins for making fibre composites | [1992/52] | French: | Liants résineux pour la fabrication de composites fibrés | [1992/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57098546 ; | [A]GB559684 (BAKELITE LTD); | [X]EP0363539 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | [A]EP0376432 (BORDEN INC [US]); | [A]EP0388145 (BORDEN UK LTD [GB]) | [X] - Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 82-62388E & JP-A-57 098 546 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) 18. Juni 1982, & JP57098546 A 00000000 |