EP0520289 - Device for programming a video recorder with a memory card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/01] | Device for programming a video recorder | ||
[1997/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | [1997/21] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states Grundig E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raab, Frank, Grundig E.M.V. holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG, Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | [1997/45] |
Former [1993/01] | 01 /
Raab, Frank, Grundig E.M.V. holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG, Kurgartenstrasse 37 W-8510 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110110.1 | 16.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914120635 | 22.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4120635 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0520289 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0520289 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520289 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G11B15/00 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
G06K19/07 (EP);
H04N5/765 (EP);
H04N5/782 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/30] | G06K19/07, H04N7/167 | ||
Former IPC [1993/01] | G06K19/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Programmierung eines Videorecorders mit einer Datenträgerkarte | [1997/45] | English: | Device for programming a video recorder with a memory card | [1997/45] | French: | Dispositif de programmation d'un magnétoscope avec une carte à mémoire | [1997/45] |
Former [1993/01] | Vorrichtung zur Programmierung eines Videorecorders | ||
Former [1993/01] | Device for programming a video recorder | ||
Former [1993/01] | Dispositif de programmation d'un magnétoscope | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3637684 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [X]EP0328440 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]); | [AP]EP0436472 (SISVEL SPA [IT]) | [A] - FUNKSCHAU Nr. 5, 24. Februar 1989, Seiten 59 - 62 CHARLES SCHEPERS 'DER SCHL]SSEL ZUM SCRAMBLING-PROBLEM?' |