EP0521337 - Mixing device fixed to an extruder for raw material and small components especially for colour additions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Theysohn GmbH Borweg 27 D-32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states FRIEDRICH THEYSOHN GmbH Borweg 27 D-32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | ||
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states FRIEDRICH THEYSOHN GMBH Borweg 27 W-4970 Bad Oeynhausen 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellmann, Bernhard Gesmolder Strasse 240 W-4520 Melle 2 / DE | 02 /
Krüger, Ernst, Dr. Ravensberger Freistuhl 11 W-4504 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92110134.1 | 16.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914121649 | 29.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121649 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521337 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/60, B01F15/02 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
B29B7/603 (EP);
B29B7/38 (EP);
B29C48/29 (EP);
B29C48/39 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP);
B29C48/297 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1993/01] | Title | German: | Mischvorrichtung an einem Extruder für Rohstoff und Kleinkomponenten, insbesondere für Farbzusätze | [1993/01] | English: | Mixing device fixed to an extruder for raw material and small components especially for colour additions | [1993/01] | French: | Dispositif de mélange attaché à une extrudeuse pour des matières primaires et des composants en petites quantité en particulier des additions colorantes | [1993/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1530143 (SIMON SNYDER); | [A]US1625917 (SIMON SNYDER); | [Y]GB679091 (PIRELLI); | [Y]GB741431 (ALITE MACHINES LTD); | [A]CA1059473 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD); | [A]EP0060046 (GULF OIL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0395926 (WEBER HANS JUERGEN [DE], et al) |